EP1589732 - Folding cellular phone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, IT | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warren & Lewis Investment Corporation 301 Park Avenue Falls Church VA 22046 / US | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirota, Hirobumi Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2005/43] | 01 /
Shirota, Hirobumi Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [2012/52] |
Former [2005/43] | Baronetzky, Klaus Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008077.9 | 13.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040124308 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004124308 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589732 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1589732 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1589732 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1589732 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2010/20] | |||
[2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04M1/02 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H04M1/6008 (EP,US);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
H04M1/6016 (EP,US);
H04M1/605 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/30] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klappbares zellulares Telefon | [2005/43] | English: | Folding cellular phone | [2005/43] | French: | Téléphone cellulaire pliable | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 20.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.04.2013 | IT | 13.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/09] | GB | 13.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0993318 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,3* figure 1 *; | [X]US5818924 (KING NEAL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 50 *; | [A]US6292563 (CLARK JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 1 - line 35 *; | [X]GB2381989 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-17 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 7 * * page 8, line 8 - page 10, line 14 * * page 11, line 16 - line 19 * * page 12, line 9 - line 14 * * page 14, line 14 - line 17 * | Examination | JP2002111825 | JP2003087379 | GB2381989 | by applicant | US5818924 | GB2381989 | JP2003348205 |