EP1557307 - Heating, ventilation, and air conditioning unit for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Toshiya, Calsonic Kansei Corp. 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Toshiyuki, Calsonic Kansei Corp. 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 03 /
Koshida, Katsuaki, Calsonic Kansei Corp. 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 04 /
Kurokawa, Katsuhiro, Calsonic Kansei Corp. 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008681.8 | 20.07.1998 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | JP19970264050 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26405097 | JP19970264055 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26405597 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557307 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557307 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
B60H1/00678 (EP,US);
B60H1/00064 (EP,US);
B60H1/00692 (EP,US);
B60H1/00842 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00164 (EP,US);
B60H2001/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/30] | Title | German: | Heizungs-, Lüftungs- und Klimaanlage für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2005/30] | English: | Heating, ventilation, and air conditioning unit for automotive vehicles | [2005/30] | French: | Unité de chauffage, de ventilation et de conditionnement d'air pour véhicules automobiles | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal [2010/27] | Appeal following examination | 17.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T0662/08 | 04.03.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.01.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98113506.4 / EP0911196 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5016704 (ONO HITOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 65 - column 9, line 46; figures 1-3 *[A] 2,3,5-8,12,14-18,20; | [XA]US5195574 (TANAKA KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5-8,12,14-18,20 | Examination | EP0911196 |