EP1591234 - Laminated glass and interlayer for use in such a laminated glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Yutaka K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Yuji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Kuribayashi, Akihiko K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Nishihama, Jirou Asahi Glass Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-asahi Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun Aichi / JP | 05 /
Nagai, Kuniko Asahi Glass Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-asahi Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun Aichi / JP | 06 /
Masaki, Yuuji Asahi Glass Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-asahi Taketoyo-cho Chita-gun Aichi / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009049.7 | 25.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | JP20040129726 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004129726 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591234 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B25/14, B60J1/02, B60R21/34 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/1055 (EP,US);
B32B17/10807 (EP,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,US);
B32B17/10935 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B2605/006 (US);
Y10T428/31601 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbundglasscheibe und Zwischenschicht zur Verwendung in einer solchen | [2005/44] | English: | Laminated glass and interlayer for use in such a laminated glass | [2005/44] | French: | Vitrage feuilleté et feuille intercalaire pour l'utilisation dans ceci | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/20] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1221285 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 15 * * page 5, lines 13-34,98-110 *; | [A]US3592726 (BLIZARD JOHN R) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 75 * * column 5, lines 50-70; figure 4 * * column 7, lines 1-30 *; | [A]GB1260213 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 106 - page 7, line 49 * * examples 8-13,20,29,32 *; | [X]US3762988 (CLOCK G, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, lines 31-45 * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 14 * * examples 1-7,9; table I * * tables V,VI,VIII *; | [A]US3862021 (HAGIHARA TAKAEKI, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 35-49 * * column 5, lines 16-23 * * example -; tables 1-3,5,8 *; | [A]US3959533 (KITAJ WALTER) [A] 1,2,4,5* column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 5 *; | [A]US4041208 (SEEGER NELSON V, et al) [A] 1-6,8,10 * column 1, lines 13-38 * * column 12, line 28 - column 14, line 58; table II * * column 17, lines 11-68 * * column 38, line 29 - column 42, line 37 *; | [X]GB2019777 (BFG GLASSGROUP) [X] 1-6,8,10 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 64 *; | [A]US4228267 (HIGASHIZUME RYUICHI, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4232080 (ORAIN ROGER, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 13; figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US4317862 (HONDA TOSHIO, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 68 * * column 6, lines 3-36 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 18; table 4 *; | [A]US4358329 (MASUDA EISUKE) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 59 - column 8, line 11; claim 1 *; | [X]US4822684 (HOTTA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10 * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, lines 1-35 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO9958334 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figure 3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP1371481 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, column 1, line 58 - page 3, column 4, line 47 *; | [A]DE10225555 (SAINT GOBAIN SEKURIT D GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, paragraphs 11-14 * |