EP1554932 - Use of lipo-chitooligosaccharides for increasing photosynthesis in plants and corresponding methods and compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McGill University Office of Technology Transfer, 3550 University Street Montreal Quebec H3A 2A7 / CA | [2015/08] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states McGILL UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Transfer, 3550 University Street Montreal, Quebec H3A 2A7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Donald L. 21,111 Lakeshore Road Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | 02 /
Prithiviraj, Balakrishnan Nova Scotia Agric. Coll. Dep. of Plant and Animal Sc. 58 River Road,Box 550 Truro, NS, B24 5E3 / CA | 03 /
Zhou, Xiaomin 21,111 Lakeshore Road P.O. Box 152 Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | 04 /
Souleimanov, Alfred 5340 Walkley Apt. No. 301 Montreal, QC H4V 2M7 / CA | [2014/39] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Smith, Donald L. 21,111 Lakeshore Road Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | ||
02 /
Prithiviraj, Balakrishnan Nova Scotia Agric. Coll. Dep. of Plant and Animal Sc. 58 River Road,Box 550 Truro, NS, B24 5E3 / CA | |||
03 /
Zhou, Xiaomin 21,111 Lakeshore Road P.O. Box 152 Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | |||
04 /
Souleimanov, Alfred 5340 Walkley Apt. No. 301 Montreal, QC H4V 2M7 / CA | |||
Former [2005/29] | 01 /
Smith, Donald L. 21,111 Lakeshore Road Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | ||
02 /
Prithiviraj, Balakrishnan 21,111 Lakeshore Road P.O. Box 79 Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | |||
03 /
Zhou, Xiaomin 21,111 Lakeshore Road P.O. Box 152 Ste-Anne de Bellevue, QC H9X 3V9 / CA | |||
04 /
Souleimanov, Alfred 5340 Walkley Apt. No. 301 Montreal, QC H4V 2M7 / CA | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2011/03] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05009071.1 | 06.10.2000 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | CA19992285727 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: CA 2285727 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554932 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1554932 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554932 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16, A01N63/02, A01N63/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N63/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/29] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Lipo-Chitooligosacchariden zur Erhöhung der Photosynthese in Pflanzen und entsprechende Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen | [2005/29] | English: | Use of lipo-chitooligosaccharides for increasing photosynthesis in plants and corresponding methods and compositions | [2005/29] | French: | Utilisation de lipo-chito-oligosaccharides pour accroître la photosynthèse dans les plantes, et procédés et compositions associés | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00967477.1 / EP1221846 | Divisional application(s) | EP15155275.9 / EP2907389 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000967477) is 30.04.2003 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2015 | DK | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | SE | 18.02.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | IE | 06.10.2015 | LU | 06.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | CY | 18.02.2015 | |
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 06.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | DK | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 06.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | DK | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | DK | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | DK | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
SE | 18.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5175149 (STACEY GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 46; claim - * * column 4, line 61 - line 65 *; | [X]DE19633502 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 50 * * page 12, line 60 - page 13, line 3; examples C,D *; | [A]ATA203098 (MBT TECHNOLOGY CENTER ESTABLIS [LI])[A] 1-10; | [PA]WO0004778 (BIOS AGRICULTURE INC [CA], et al) [PA] 1-10 * page 4, line 20 - page 5 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 10 * * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 2 * * page 15, paragraph L - page 16, paragraph 1; claims 22-32 *; | [PA]AT406324B (MBT TECHNOLOGY CENTER ESTABLIS [LI]) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - IMSANDE J, "ENHANCED NITROGEN FIXATION INCREASES NET PHOTOSYNTHETIC OUTPUT AND SEED YIELD OF HYDROPONICALLY GROWN SOYBEAN", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (198809), vol. 39, no. 206, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 1313 - 1322, XP008059022 [A] 1-10 * page 1313, the abstract; page 1313 - page 1314, paragraph 4 * * page 1319, paragraph 2 - page 1320 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jxb/39.9.1313 | [A] - COCKING E C ET AL, "INTERACTION OF RHIZOBIA WITH NON-LEGUNE CROPS FOR SYMBIOTIC NITROGEN FIXATION NODULATION", NATO ASI SERIES. SERIES G: ECOLOGICAL SCIENCES,US,PLENUM PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, (1995), vol. G37, ISSN 0258-1256, pages 197 - 205, XP002036775 [A] 1-10 * page 197, the abstract; page 203, paragraph L - page 204 * | [A] - ROEHRIG HORST ET AL, "Growth of tobacco protoplasts stimulated by synthetic lipo-chitooligosaccharides.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (1995), vol. 269, no. 5225, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 841 - 843, XP002160973 [A] 1-10 * page 841, the abstract; page 843, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.269.5225.841 | [A] - ANTOUN HANI ET AL, "Potential of Rhizobium and Bradyrhizobium species as plant growth promoting rhizobacteria on non-legumes: Effect on radishes (Raphanus sativus L.)", PLANT AND SOIL, (199807), vol. 204, no. 1, ISSN 0032-079X, pages 57 - 67, XP002364875 [A] 1-10 * page 57, the abstract; page 58, column R, paragraph L * * page 61, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 65, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 3 * |