EP1717208 - Device for fluid treatment, in particular for waste water treatment, with a stack of discs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Management A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7 - 11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madsen, Steffen Hulvej 1 8950 Orsted / DK | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Vollmann & Hemmer Patentanwälte Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Vollmann, Heiko, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann, Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009339.2 | 28.04.2005 | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717208 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717208 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/08 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
C02F3/082 (EP,US);
B01D29/46 (EP,US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/42 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Fluidbehandlung, insbesondere Abwasserbehandlung, mit einem Scheibenstapel | [2006/44] | English: | Device for fluid treatment, in particular for waste water treatment, with a stack of discs | [2006/44] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de fluides, en particulier de traitement des eaux usées, avec une pile de disques | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2013 | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2005 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | IT | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.04.2005 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 26.06.2013 | |
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4162195 (BJORNDAL HAKAN [SE], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 15; figure 4 * * column 7, line 6 - line 31 *; | [X]EP0222937 (UNIV SYRACUSE [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]US5855799 (HERRMANN KARL-HEINZ [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 27; figure 3 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 8 * * column 7, line 22 - line 36 *; | [AD]WO02094724 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1 * page 6, line 9 - line 11; figures 1,8 * * page 7, line 5 - line 10 * * page 7, line 23 - line 26 ** page 8, line 16 - line 20 * | by applicant | EP0222937 | WO02094724 |