EP1717063 - Bearing wheel hub unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savarese, Claudio Via Dalmazio Birago, 12 10060 Airasca (TO) / IT | 02 /
Vignotto, Angelo Via Montevideo, 48 10134 Torino / IT | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2009/16] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/44] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05009417.6 | 29.04.2005 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717063 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717063 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B60B27/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Radnabenlagereinheit | [2006/44] | English: | Bearing wheel hub unit | [2006/44] | French: | Ensemble de moyeux de roue avec paliers | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.09.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 10.09.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | IE | 29.04.2011 | LU | 29.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2011 | ||
LU | 29.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2011 | ||
LU | 29.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
LT | 18.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2109874 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH) [X] 1 * page 3, line 3 - line 23 * * page 3, line 61 - line 84 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6; | [X]US4421197 (CHANDIOUX ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 4 - line 20 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US5333939 (KRUDE WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5806936 (GUIMBRETIERE PIERRE L [FR]) [X] 1-5 [Y] 6 |