EP1605056 - Process for recovering serine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nisshin OilliO Group, Ltd. 23-1, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states The Nisshin OilliO Group, Ltd. 23-1, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamane, Tsuneo 3-22-1, Wakamizu Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Yugo 1-2-16-203, Nishiura Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Namiko 1-9-2, Amagasuka Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Takaya The Nisshin Oillio Group, Ltd. Nagoya-kojo 37-15, Shiomi-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Okada, Takahiro c/oThe Nisshin Oillio Group, Ltd. Yokosuka Jigyojo 1,Shinmei-Cho,Yokosuka-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009497.8 | 29.04.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040138952 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004138952 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605056 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605056 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/04, C07F9/10 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C07F9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wiedergewinnung von Serin | [2005/50] | English: | Process for recovering serine | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé de récupération de la sérine | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 15.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0279990 ; | [DA]EP0776976 (ITALFARMACO SUD SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-4 * example -; claims 9,12 *; | [A]DE19917249 (MEYER LUCAS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP1048738 (CHEMI SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-4 * example - *; | [DA]EP1223222 (RINORU OIL MILLS CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1231213 (FIDIA FARMACEUTICI [IT]) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0098] *; | [DA]US2002155558 (KIRSCHNER GUENTER [IT], et al) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0025] , [0085] *; | [DA] - JUNEJA L R ET AL, "Conversion of phosphatidylcholine to phosphatidylserine by various phospholipases D in the presence of L- or D-serine", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1989), vol. 1003, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 277 - 283, XP000645929 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * | [DA] - JUNEJA L R ET AL, "Increasing productivity by removing choline in conversion of phosphatidylcholine to phosphatidylserine by phospholipase D", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, (1992), vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 0922-338X, pages 357 - 361, XP002348562 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(92)90278-3 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900612), vol. 014, no. 270, Database accession no. (C - 0727), & JP02079990 A 19900320 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * |