EP1616513 - Textile article, in particular an article of bedding and method for producing a textile article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fleissner GmbH Wolfsgartenstrasse 6 63328 Egelsbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Fleissner GmbH Wolfsgartenstr.6 63328 Egelsbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watzl, Alfred Am Buchrain 38 B 63322 Rödermark / DE | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/46] |
Former [2006/03] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann Patentanwalt, Metzlerstrasse 27 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009651.0 | 03.05.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | DE20041034249 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004034249 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616513 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/02, D04H1/46 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
A47G9/0238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] |
Former [2006/38] | |||
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wäsche insbesondere Bettwäsche und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bettwäsche | [2006/03] | English: | Textile article, in particular an article of bedding and method for producing a textile article | [2006/03] | French: | Article de textile, particulièrement article de litterie et procédé de fabrication d'un article de textile | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | 08.09.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.09.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   13.09.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07148057 ; | [X]US3568227 (DUNHAM PHILIP N) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, line 19 - line 34; figure - *; | [X]US5634243 (RIPLEY W G [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 1, line 15 - line 23 * * column 7, line 44 - line 62 *; | [X]US5766746 (KAMPL REINHARD [AT], et al) [X] 1-7 * claim 14 * * column 3, line 18 - line 57 * * column 4, line 37 - line 44 * * column 4, line 58 - line 61 * * column 7, line 44 - line 49 *; | [X]NL1010029C (PROECO B V I O [NL]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 6 *; | [X]US2002124366 (HIRSCH GARY F [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraphs [0063] , [0074] , [0084] *; | [X]WO03000976 (UNIV LEEDS [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph L * * claims 1,9,46,47 *; | [X]WO2004023943 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract ** claims 1,6,8,9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07148057 A 19950613 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * |