EP1566897 - A mobile station in a transmission diversity system and respective method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichihara, Masaki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Furuya, Yukitsuna c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009859.9 | 26.04.1996 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | JP19950128891 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: JP 12889195 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1566897 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1566897 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
H04B7/061 (EP,US);
H04B7/02 (KR);
H04B7/0619 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B17/364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2005/34] | Title | German: | Mobilstation in einem Diversitysübertragungssystem und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2005/34] | English: | A mobile station in a transmission diversity system and respective method | [2005/34] | French: | Station mobile dans un système de transmission en diversité et procédé correspondant | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96106624.8 / EP0741465 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960106624) is 10.12.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0288904 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * abstract *; column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 15 * * column 6, line 2 - line 20 * * column 6, line 36 - line 50 * * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 20 ** figures 4,5,9,11,13 *; | [A]EP0479741 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * abstract *; column 1, line 48 - line 53 * * column 2, line 23 - line 30 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 15 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0702462 (AT & T CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 59 * * column 5, line 5 - line 12 * * column 8, line 20 - line 32 * * column 10, line 5 - line 14 * * column 11, line 30 - line 45 * * column 15, line 35 - column 16, line 37 * * figures 1-4 * |