EP1616816 - Collapsible container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sager, Bruno Kleinweid 8 6330 Cham / CH | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Sager, Bruno Soppensee 6123 Geiss / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert, et al Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Apollostrasse 2 Postfach 1021 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert, et al Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Apollostrasse 2, Postfach 1021 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/03] | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert, et al Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Löwenstrasse 19 8021 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05010123.7 | 10.05.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | EP20040015864 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04015864 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616816 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1616816 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616816 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16N31/00 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
F16N31/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | B65D88/52, B65D90/04, F16N35/00, F01M11/00, B65D37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Title | German: | Zusammenlegbarer Behälter | [2006/03] | English: | Collapsible container | [2006/03] | French: | Recipient repliable | [2008/52] |
Former [2006/03] | Recipient démontable | Examination procedure | 03.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IE | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | PL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | GB | 10.05.2009 | LU | 10.05.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
LU | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
LU | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
GB | 10.05.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | EE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | EE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5090588 (VAN ROMER EDWARD W [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, lines 20-58; figure - *; | [A]US5316175 (VAN ROMER EDWARD W [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 7; figure - *; | [A]EP0962690 (ROMER EDWARD W VAN [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0010]; figure - *; | [A]US2003029873 (MOFFAT DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0018] - [0021]; figure - * |