EP1563808 - Intervertebral disc nucleus implants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states SDGI Holdings, Inc. Suite 300, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trieu, Hai H. 1323 Graystone Lane Cordova, TN 38018 / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05010361.3 | 30.08.2001 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | US20000650525 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 650525 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563808 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563808 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/46, A61L27/14 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/441 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61F2/30965 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30133 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30179 (EP,US);
A61F2002/302 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30291 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30838 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30891 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30906 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30909 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30925 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4415 (EP,US);
A61F2002/444 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0015 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0065 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Bandscheibenimplantate | [2005/33] | English: | Intervertebral disc nucleus implants | [2005/33] | French: | Implants de disque intervertébral | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01964506.8 / EP1313412 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | BE | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IT | 30.08.2008 | LU | 30.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | IE | 01.09.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0621020 (SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH]) [X] 37,38 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 14 * * page 3, line 40 - line 53 * * page 4, line 19 - line 31 * * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 13 * * figures 1,6-8; claims 1-12 *; | [X]FR2712486 (BRESLAVE PATRICE [FR], et al) [X] 24-27 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5716416 (LIN CHIH-I [US]) [X] 24-30,37-39 * figure -; claims 1-14 *; | [A]DE19710392 (HAEHNEL MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-11* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5919235 (HUSSON JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure -; claim - *; | [PX]WO0106962 (BAAT B V ENGINEERING [NL], et al) [PX] 1,2,16,18,19,22,24-27,37-39 * figures 1A-G,,4,5,9A,9B,,12; claim - *; | [PX]WO0128468 (CAUTHEN RES GROUP INC [US], et al) [PX] 31-36 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 16 * * page 7, line 5 - line 30 * * figures 8-14; claim - *; | [PX]WO0145577 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-5 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 6; claim - * |