EP1605311 - Illumination device with light mixer for homogenisation of radiation distributions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiolka, Damian Heckenrosenweg 36 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 02 /
Singer, Wolfgang Egerlandstrasse 45 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
Wangler, Johannes An der Reute 15 89551 Königsbronn / DE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Schwanhäusser, Gernot, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Schwanhäusser, Gernot, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010584.0 | 17.05.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | US20040578521P | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 578521 P | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605311 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605311 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G03F7/70583 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G03F7/70075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/47] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einem Lichtmischer zur Homogenisierung von Strahlungsverteilungen | [2005/50] | English: | Illumination device with light mixer for homogenisation of radiation distributions | [2005/50] | French: | Dispositif d'illumination avec mélangeur de lumière pour l'homogénéisation des distributions de rayonnement | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 15.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0043822 (TROPEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 ** page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 27 *; | [A]US6347176 (HAWRYLUK ANDREW M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 2A,2B *; | [A]EP1217450 (ZEISS CARL SEMICONDUCTOR MFG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] * |