EP1598206 - Heat sensitive recording material and microcapsule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Hisahiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Jimbo, Yoshihiro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Nagase, Hisato Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Aoshima, Toshihide Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010864.6 | 19.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040149816 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149816 | JP20040149819 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149819 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598206 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598206 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/54 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G03C1/54 (EP,US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US);
G03C1/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | B41M5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial und Mikrokapseln | [2005/47] | English: | Heat sensitive recording material and microcapsule | [2005/47] | French: | Matériau thermosensible pour l'enregistrement et microcapsule | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003246146 ; | [A]EP0827020 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 17, line 30 *; | [A]US2003045426 (ITO KORESHIGE [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0146] ** paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0159] *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 14, Database accession no. 2004-137207, XP002373183 & JP2003246146 A 20030902 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |