EP1698731 - Drilling device for subsoil improvement by columns in soil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELLER GRUNDBAU GmbH Kaiserleistrasse 44 63067 Offenbach/Main / DE | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrempp, Arthur Poststrasse 24 77871 Renchen / DE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010922.2 | 20.05.2005 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | DE20051010555 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005010555 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698731 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/12 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
E21B27/00 (EP,US);
E02D5/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/19] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bohrwerkzeug zur Baugrundverbesserung durch Materialsäulen im Boden | [2006/36] | English: | Drilling device for subsoil improvement by columns in soil | [2006/36] | French: | Outil de forage pour améliorer le terrain des fondations avec des colonnes de matériel dans le sol | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 07.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/45] | 30.06.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07138936 ; | [Y]JPS55111523 ; | [X]JPH1088564 ; | [Y]US5919005 (RUPIPER STAN [US]) [Y] 15,16 * column 3, line 64 - line 65; figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07138936 A 19950530 (SANKI SEIKOSHO:KK) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 8,12,15,16 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801111), vol. 004, no. 161, Database accession no. (M - 040), & JP55111523 A 19800828 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO LTD) [Y] 8,12 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10088564 A 19980407 (TOYO CONSTR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102005001227 |