EP1602951 - Optical true-time delay apparatus using a tapered fibre with Bragg grating and thin-film heater and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong, Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Seh-Won Miseong Apt. 8-414 Sincheon-Dong Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Sang-Shin Woobang Apt. 404-205, Gongneung 2-Dong Nowon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg) Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05010963.6 | 20.05.2005 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | KR20040039331 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004039331 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602951 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/16, G02F1/01, G02B6/293 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
G02B6/2861 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/021 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02204 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/2848 (KR);
G02F1/0115 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2201/307 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/33] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Echtzeitverzögerungs-Vorrichtung mit einer getaperten Faser mit Bragg-Gitter und Dünn-Film-Heizer und Herstellungsmethode selbiger | [2005/49] | English: | Optical true-time delay apparatus using a tapered fibre with Bragg grating and thin-film heater and manufacturing method thereof | [2005/49] | French: | Appareil optique à rétardement en temps réel utilisant une fibre effilée avec réseau de Bragg et chauffage à mince couche et procédé de son fabrication | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5420948 (BYRON KEVIN C [GB]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9626458 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 5 - line 29 ** page 4, line 15 - line 28 *; | [Y]WO9815859 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 6 * page 3, line 5 - line 16 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 11; figure 17B *; | [A]WO0178200 (HRL LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 7; figure 5 *; | [A]WO0227744 (CIDRA CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 7 - page 8, line 10; figures 5-13 *; | [XY]WO02075391 (CIDRA CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10-12 * page 16, line 1 - line 26; figures 10-12 * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP1327902 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 44; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO03093885 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 4 *; | [XY] - N.Q. NGO ET AL., "ELECTRICALLY TUNABLE DISPERSION COMPENSATOR WITH FIXED CENTER WAVELENGTH USING FIBER BRAGG GRATING", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (20030606), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 1568 - 1575, XP002338285 [X] 1-4,7-12 * page 1568, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1572, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1574, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [Y] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2003.812153 | [Y] - ROGERS J A ET AL, "DISTRIBUTED ON-FIBER THIN FILM HEATERS FOR BRAGG GRATINGS WITH ADJUSTABLE CHIRP", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19990524), vol. 74, no. 21, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3131 - 3133, XP000834762 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124085 | [Y] - KHIJWANIA S K ET AL, "A novel tunable dispersion slope compensator based on nonlinearly thermally chirped fiber Bragg grating", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20031101), vol. 227, no. 1-3, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 107 - 113, XP004470225 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optcom.2003.09.033 |