EP1726950 - Cartridge for storing test elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulat, Jochen Lange Roetterstrasse 45 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Mueller, Josef Dietschwilerstrasse 7 9533 Kirchberg SG / CH | 03 /
Braendle, Hansjörg Wartstrasse 3 9244 Niederuzwill / CH | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011188.9 | 24.05.2005 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726950 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/48757 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magazin zur Aufnahme von Testelementen | [2006/48] | English: | Cartridge for storing test elements | [2006/48] | French: | Magasin de stockage d'éléments d'analyse | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003002387 (BOTTWEIN GUNTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0056] - [0058]; figures 8a-8e *; | [X]US2003191415 (MOERMAN PIET [BE], et al) [X] 1-10,13-21,23-26 * paragraph [0188]; figures 1,28 *; | [A]EP1507143 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-26* figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1529488 (EHRFELD MIKROTECHNIK AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,13-24,26 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,5-7 * |