EP1600762 - Imaging device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSC Process- und Laborsysteme GmbH Carl-Borgward-Str. 18 56566 Neuwied / DE | [2005/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Windheuser, Richard An der Marienkirche 19 56566 Neuwied / DE | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2005/48] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011233.3 | 24.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | DE20041025666 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025666 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1600762 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1600762 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G02B27/00 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G02B27/0006 (EP,US);
G01N21/15 (EP);
G01N21/89 (EP);
G01N21/8901 (EP);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
G01N2021/151 (EP);
G01N2021/8917 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bilderfassung | [2005/48] | English: | Imaging device | [2005/48] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement d'images | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4432286 (WITTE ARVEL B [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10* column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 4 *; | [X]EP0558278 (IMATRAN VOIMA OY [FI]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 14; claim 1 * * column 3, line 7 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5394208 (CAMPBELL DEAN B [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * column 2 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 22; figure 3 *; | [X]US6362889 (MUSTONEN MARKKU [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |