EP1608187 - Signaling in broadcast communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/51] | Method and system for signaling in broadcast communication system | ||
[2009/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sinnarajah, Ragulan 63 Drawbridge Drive Markham, Ontario L6C2G8 / CA | 02 /
Chen, Tao 5415 Harvest Run Drive San Diego, California 92130 / US | 03 /
Wang, Jun 426 Bonair Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 04 /
Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | 05 /
Bender, Paul E. 2879 Angell Avenue San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
Sinnarajah, Ragulan 603 South Unionville Avenue Markham, Ontario L3R 4T4 / CA | ||
02 /
Chen, Tao 5415 Harvest Run Drive San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
03 /
Wang, Jun 426 Bonair Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | |||
04 /
Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | |||
05 /
Bender, Paul E. 2879 Angell Avenue San Diego, California 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011241.6 | 20.08.2002 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20010933978 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: US 933978 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608187 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1608187 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608187 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04W4/06 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H04H20/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04H20/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04H40/27 (EP,KR,US);
H04H60/91 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (KR);
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/22 | ||
Former IPC [2005/51] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Signalisierung in einem Rundsendekommunikationssystem | [2009/30] | English: | Signaling in broadcast communication system | [2009/30] | French: | Signalisation dans un système de communication par radiodiffusion | [2009/30] |
Former [2005/51] | Verfahren und System zur Signalisierung in einem Rundsendekommunikationssystem | ||
Former [2005/51] | Method and system for signaling in broadcast communication system | ||
Former [2005/51] | Procédé et système pour signaler dans un système de communication par radiodiffusion | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02759409.2 / EP1421803 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | GR | 03.03.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | LU | 20.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
LU | 20.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9610895 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 22,23 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 35; figure 3 * * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 23 *; | [A]US5642398 (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 9, line 12 - line 27 * * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 55 *; | [A]WO9952304 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 1 - line 32 * * page 2, line 15 - line 27 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 36; figure 1 * * page 8, line 6 - line 19; figure 2 * * page 9, line 5 - line 13 ** page 10, line 35 - page 12, line 4 *; | [XY]WO0110146 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 24,25,28,29 * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 5; figure 2 * [Y] 26,27,30,31; | [XA] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (phase 2+);Voice Broadcast Service (VBS); Stage 2 (GSM 03.69 version 7.0.0 release 1998)", ETSI TS 100 934 V7.0.0, XX, XX, (19990801), pages 18,19 - 20, XP002220268 [X] 11,18-21 * page 19, paragraph 11.3.1.3 - page 20 * [A] 1-10,12-17 | [YA] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+) (GSM);Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) Service decsription; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.060 version 3.8.0 Release 1999)", ETSI TS 123 060 V3.8.0, XX, XX, (20010601), XP002220269 [Y] 26,27,30,31 * page 134, paragraph 9.3 - page 135 * [A] 1-21 | [A] - EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, "DIGITAL CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (PHASE 2+);TECHNICAL REALIZATION OF SHORT MESSAGE SERVICE CELL BROADCAST (SMSCB) (GSM 03.41 VERSION 5.8.1)", EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARD, XX, XX, (199806), no. ETS 300 902, pages 1 - 30, XP002128897 [A] 22-31 * page 8 * * page 24 * | by applicant | WO9610895 | WO0110146 | US20010279970 |