EP1630519 - Modular apparatus for systems performing 3-D virtual reconstruction of surfaces of objects, as well as system comprising a plurality of such apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROTEC S.r.l. Via Julius Durst 98 39042 Bressanone (Bolzano) / IT | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giudiceandrea, Federico Via Portici Minori 8 39042 Bressanone (BZ) / IT | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Ponchiroli, Simone, et al Ruffini Ponchiroli e Associati S.r.l. Via Caprera, 6 37126 Verona / IT | [2010/20] |
Former [2010/03] | Lissandrini, Marco, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via Pancaldo 68 37138 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2006/17] | Ponchiroli, Simone Bugnion S.p.A. Via Garibaldi, 19 37121 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2006/09] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria c/o Bugnion S.p.A., Via Perathoner 31 39100 Bolzano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05011308.3 | 25.05.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | IT2004BZ00044 | 24.08.2004 Original published format: IT BZ20040044 | [2006/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630519 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G01B11/245 (EP);
G01B11/2545 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Modularer Bestandteil für Vorrichtungen zur Ausführung der dreidemensionalen virtuellen Rekonstruktion der Oberflächen von Körpern sowie derartige eine Vielzahl von modularen Bestandteilen umfassende Vorrichtung | [2006/09] | English: | Modular apparatus for systems performing 3-D virtual reconstruction of surfaces of objects, as well as system comprising a plurality of such apparatuses | [2006/09] | French: | Dispositif modulaire pour systèmes de reconstruction virtuelle 3-D de surfaces d'objets, ainsi que système comprenant une pluralité de tels dispositifs | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0320391 (CENTRE TECHN BOIS AMEUBLEMENT [FR]) [Y] 3,5-7 * figure 6 * [A] 1,2,4; | [XY]US2002024677 (METCALFE LEONARD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0051] - [0059] - [0076] - [0079]; claim 1 * * figures 3,7 * [Y] 3,5-7; | [A] - ZHOU L ET AL, Correction technique to compensate the form error in 3D profilometry, MEASUREMENT, INSTITUTE OF MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL. LONDON, GB, PAGE(S) 117-123, (199803), ISSN 0263-2241, XP004123934 [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0263-2241(98)00014-1 | by applicant | EP0320391 | US2002024677 | - ZHOU L ET AL., "Correction technique to compensate the form error in 3D profilometry", MEASUREMENT, INSTITUTE OF MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, (199803), doi:doi:10.1016/S0263-2241(98)00014-1, pages 117 - 123, XP004123934 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0263-2241(98)00014-1 |