EP1600197 - Game apparatus and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 1-4-8, Komagata Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | For all designated states NAMCO BANDAI Games Inc. 1-21, Yaguchi 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Q Entertainment, Inc. 201/301, 3-2-3, Shimomeguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Sakurai, Masahiro 107-4-702, Bentencho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states NAMCO BANDAI Games Inc. 1-21, Yaguchi 2-chome Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Q Entertainment, Inc. 201/301, 3-2-3, Shimomeguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states Sakurai, Masahiro 107-4-702, Bentencho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 1-4-8, Komagata Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Q Entertainment, Inc. 201/301, 3-2-3, Shimomeguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states Sakurai, Masahiro 107-4-702, Bentencho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuguchi, Tetsuya c/o Q Entertainment, Inc. 1-27-3, Fukasawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakurai, Masahiro 107-4-702, Bentencho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011410.7 | 25.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | JP20040157986 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004157986 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600197 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/80 (US);
A63F13/42 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/537 (US);
A63F2300/64 (EP,US);
A63F2300/8094 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür. | [2005/48] | English: | Game apparatus and control method therefor | [2005/48] | French: | Dispositif de jeu et méthode de controle pour le même. | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/40] | 28.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/40] | Appeal following examination | 26.06.2009 | Appeal received No. T1782/09 | 25.08.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 05.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |