EP1728483 - Hand-piece with coating for moving or moveable parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach / DE | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Rainer Lärchenweg 1 88255 Baienfurt / DE | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011617.7 | 30.05.2005 | [2006/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728483 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/10, A61C1/12, A61C1/14 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
A61C1/10 (EP,US);
A61C1/12 (EP,US);
A61C1/14 (EP,US);
A61C1/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/33] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Handstück mit Beschichtung für bewegte oder bewegbare Teile | [2006/49] | English: | Hand-piece with coating for moving or moveable parts | [2006/49] | French: | Pièce à main avec revêtement pour parties mobiles | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4446985 (MORITA MFG [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * column 6, paragraph 1 * * column 7 - column 8 * * column 11 * * column 15, lines 33-37 * * figures 1-15 *; | [A]DE19801535 (MORITA TOKYO SEISAKUSHO YONO K [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 3-5 * * column 2, line 43 - line 47 * * column 3 * * column 4, line 32 - line 35 ** figures 1-5b *; | [Y]US6007390 (CHENG YANG-TSE [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, lines 48-53 * * column 2, lines 4-6 * * column 2, line 64 * * column 5, lines 24-30 *; | [Y]EP1225353 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 46, paragraph 267 - paragraph 268 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO02076633 (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 4 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE4406855 | DE19629902 | WO03071973 | WO2004056280 |