EP1579846 - Personal care product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dial Corporation 15501 North Dial Boulevard Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galante, Cheryl, L. 870 Summer Street Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | 02 /
Elliott, David, L. 7 Rudon Court North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 03 /
Gersten, Iris, Davis 307 Twisted Stalked Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 04 /
Solan, James, L. 14809 Lake Terrace Rockville, MD 20853 / US | 05 /
van der Lee, Hermes 3811 Park Lake Drive Rockviille, MD 20853-3201 / US | [2005/44] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
Galante, Cheryl, L. 870 Summer Street Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | ||
02 /
Elliott, David, L. 7 Rudon Court North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | |||
03 /
Gersten, Iris, Davis 307 Twisted Stalked Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | |||
04 /
Solan, James, L. 14809 Lake Terrace Rockville, MD 20853 / US | |||
05 /
van der Lee, Hermes 1008 Ashland Drive Ashton, MD 20861 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011689.6 | 14.02.2002 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | US20010784488 | 15.02.2001 Original published format: US 784488 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1579846 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1579846 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32, A61K7/38 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/0229 (EP,US);
A61K8/0237 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Körperpflegemittel | [2005/39] | English: | Personal care product | [2005/39] | French: | Produit de soin personnel | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02723155.4 / EP1361852 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1791359 (ARTHUR HENRIKSEN) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4202879 (SHELTON DAVID L [US]) [A] 1 * column 15, lines 5,6,13-15,26-35,61-66; figures 1,3,4; claim - *; | [A]WO9219222 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [DA]US5200174 (GARDLIK JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]US5705171 (IOVANNI CARL F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9956716 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-9 * examples 9,13; claim - * * page 17, lines 5,17 * * page 11, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO0067712 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, paragraphs 2,5; claim - * * page 5, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 6, paragraph 5 * |