EP1612065 - Hitchball cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH Am Sandberg 45 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Westfalia Automotive GmbH & Co. KG Am Sandberg 45 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domke, Friedrich Am Holzplatz 7a 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Valentin-Gihske-Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011806.6 | 01.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | DE20042010452U | 03.07.2004 Original published format: DE 202004010452 U | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612065 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612065 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/60 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B60D1/605 (EP);
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Schutzkappe | [2006/01] | English: | Hitchball cover | [2006/01] | French: | Protection de boule d'attelage | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | GB | 01.08.2007 | IE | 01.08.2007 | LT | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | PL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | IS | 01.12.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
LT | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
IS | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 01.08.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 01.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU759343 (TRIGER BORIS G [SU], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3623426 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0274160 (STIDSEN POUL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9214195U (SEIFERT, EBERHARD, 6120 ERBACH, DE) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |