EP1607259 - Cover unit with a pivotable lid for top storage compartment for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2008/40] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states ISE Industries GmbH Dortmunder Str. 54 58455 Witten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Meik Hölderlinstrasse 24 47226 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Kamphaus, Jürgen Neunkirchener Strasse 11 47059 Duisburg / DE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/40] |
Former [2005/51] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Flasskuhle 6 58452 Witten / DE | Application number, filing date | 05011965.0 | 03.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | DE20041028447 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004028447 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607259 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607259 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/20 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B60J7/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abdeckeinheit mit einem verschwenkbaren Verdeckkastendeckel für einen Verdeckkasten eines Fahrzeugs | [2005/51] | English: | Cover unit with a pivotable lid for top storage compartment for vehicle | [2005/51] | French: | Unité pour couvrir avec un couvercle pivotable pour compartiment de rangement de toit de véhicule | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.04.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | [2011/15] |
Former [2009/46] | ES | 26.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4445941 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 2; figure - *; | [A]DE19714105 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0970834 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US6053559 (HABERL FRANZ [DE], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US6520561 (MIKLOSI STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [A]US2003227189 (RUSSKE KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |