EP1605308 - Apparatus and method for transferring a pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | Apparatus | ||
[2006/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Eigo c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ota, Hirohisa c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Takashi c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kasumi, Kazuyuki c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tokita, Toshinobu c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012232.4 | 07.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040173317 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004173317 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605308 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1605308 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605308 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605308 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/19] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übertragung eines Musters | [2006/02] | English: | Apparatus and method for transferring a pattern | [2006/02] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour transférer un modèle | [2006/02] |
Former [2005/50] | Apparat | ||
Former [2005/50] | Apparatus | ||
Former [2005/50] | Appareil | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.10.2010 | FR | 30.06.2011 | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/03] | IT | 27.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0207199 (NANONEX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 4 - page 5; figure 2; claim 37 *; | [X]WO0208835 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 7, line 34 - page 9, line 21; figures 2a-2e; claims 32,35 *; | [X]US2004046288 (CHOU STEPHEN Y [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 23, paragraph 52 - page 35; figures 2a-2e; claim 11 *; | [PX]WO2004055594 (MOLECULAR IMPRINTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-20* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 * |