EP1605633 - System for handover in BWA communication system and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jung-Won Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Tae-Won Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Wang, Bo-Kyung Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Chang, Yong Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Chang, Hong-Sung Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/18] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
Kim, Jung-Won Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Tae-Won Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Wang, Bo-Kyung Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Chang, Yong Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Chang, Hong-Sung Samsung Electronics Co.Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-gi Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012240.7 | 07.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | KR20040041542 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004041542 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605633 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605633 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605633 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP,US);
H04W36/0061 (KR);
H04W36/08 (KR);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | 28.08.2009 | BA | 28.08.2009 | YU | 28.08.2009 | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für Weiterreichung in einem BWA Kommunikationssystem | [2005/50] | English: | System for handover in BWA communication system and method thereof | [2005/50] | French: | Système et procédé pour le transfert dans un système de communication BWA | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11155412.7 / EP2330848 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | IE | 07.06.2013 | LU | 07.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6173181 (LOSH JASON HAINES [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * figures 1,4-7 * * column 1 - column 3, line 41 ** column 5, line 48 - column 8, line 10 *; | [XP]EP1473956 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-26 * page 2, paragraph 9 * * figures 6-11 *; | [E]EP1571786 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-26 * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 3, paragraph 14 * * tables 1-4 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X] - Sohyun Kim; Yeongmoon Son; Jungje Son; Changhoi Koo, "Inter-Sector HO scenario", IEEE C802.16e-04/58, (20040507), pages 0 - 7, Samsung Elec., URL: http://www.ieee802.org/16/tge/contrib/C80216e-04_58.pdf, (20100623), XP002588651 [X] 1-26 * page 1 - page 7 * | by applicant | EP1473956 | EP1571786 | - KIM ET AL., "Inter-Sector HO scenario", SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, IEEE C802.16E-04/58, (20040507), pages 0 - 7 |