EP1604888 - Method and device to transport steering and drive train units on a transporter vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPW Italia s.r.l. Via Flavio Gioia, 5/7 37135 Verona / IT | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhein, Bernd Lombachstrasse 25 51491 Overath / DE | 02 /
Sironi, Massimo Loc. Colombara del Monti 155H 37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT | 03 /
Beltrami, Stefano Via Ca'del Cozzi, 4A 37124 Verona / IT | [2009/10] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
Rhein, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Lombachstrasse 25 51491 Overath / DE | ||
02 /
Sironi, Massimo, Ing. Loc. Colombara del Monti 155H 37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT | |||
03 /
Beltrami, Stefano, Ing. Via Ca'del Cozzi, 4A 37124 Verona / IT | Representative(s) | Christophersen, Ulrich Rudolf, et al Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Christophersen, Ulrich Rudolf, et al Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Feldstrasse 73 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012310.8 | 08.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | DE20041028541 | 12.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004028541 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1604888 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1604888 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604888 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/18, B60P3/08, B60P1/64, B65D19/44 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
B62D65/18 (EP);
B60P1/64 (EP);
B60P3/08 (EP);
B65D19/44 (EP);
B65D2585/6867 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | B62D65/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2007/27] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE | ||
Former [2007/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Transport von Lenk- und Antriebseinheiten sowie Anordnung von Transporthilfsmitteln zu deren Transport auf einem Transportfahrzeug | [2005/50] | English: | Method and device to transport steering and drive train units on a transporter vehicle | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le transport d'unités d'entraînement et de direction sur un véhicule de transport | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 05.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2007 | 08.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2007 | 08.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003150757 (DUNN LARRY W [US]) [A] 1-3,5-8,10-14,18-22 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 26 *; | [A]WO02051722 (TTS SHIPS EQUIPMENT AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,9,10,23 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 34 *; | [A]DE4447560 (WEBER HANS JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 4 - column 2, line 59 * * column 6, line 9 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]US2119193 (AVERY CLARENCE W) [A] 1,4,6,7 * figure 17 * * page 3, column R, line 24 - page 3, column R, line 40 * | Examination | DE20214245U | NL1012102C | GB466214 | by applicant | EP0308574 | WO02051722 | DE4447560 |