EP1677577 - Self-regulating heater assembly and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tom Richards, Inc. 7010 Lindsay Drive Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lokar, Raymond 33705 Lakeshore Boulevard Eastlake Ohio 44095 / US | 02 /
Lokar, Richard 3550 New Hudson Road Orwell Ohio 44076 / US | 03 /
Lucas, Nathan 18131 Greatwood Lane Mantua Ohio 44255 / US | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Zenz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Schmidt, Frank-Michael, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Schmidt, Frank-Michael, et al Patentanwälte Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner GbR Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012315.7 | 08.06.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | US20040026416 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 26416 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1677577 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1677577 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/12 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
H05B3/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | Selbstregulierendes Heizsystem und das Herstellungsverfahren desgleichen | [2006/27] | English: | Self-regulating heater assembly and method of manufacturing same | [2006/27] | French: | Ensemble de chauffage autorégulé et sa méthode de fabrication | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 22.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4395623 (SHIMADA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 53 *; | [A]DE3201367 (TUERK & HILLINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 4, lines 9-31 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US4972067 (LOKAR RAYMOND S [US], et al) [DA] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 5 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE29715440U (TUERK & HILLINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, lines 13-27 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6075806 (WITTLE J KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 4-6,9-14,21,22 * abstract * * figures 2-7 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 21 ** column 9, lines 37-59 * | by applicant | US4395623 | US4972067 |