|
09.03.2012 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.06.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
44 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
47 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |