EP1624130 - System with at least two structural components and manufacturing process of such a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/06] | Covering element with at least two structural components and manufacturing process of such a component | ||
[2012/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Tiroler Strasse 16 3105 Unterradlberg / AT | [2010/51] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states E.F.P. Floor Products Fussböden GmbH Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiter, Bruno Weitauweg 25a 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05012815.6 | 15.06.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | DE20041037802 | 03.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004037802 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1624130 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1624130 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624130 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1624130 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04F15/04 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP);
E04F13/08 (EP);
E04F13/0898 (EP);
E04F15/02016 (EP);
E04F2201/0153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | 09.01.2007 | BA | 09.01.2007 | HR | 09.01.2007 | LV | 09.01.2007 | MK | 09.01.2007 | YU | 09.01.2007 | Title | German: | System mit mindestens zwei Bauteilen und Herstellungsverfahren eines Bauteils | [2013/04] | English: | System with at least two structural components and manufacturing process of such a component | [2012/24] | French: | Système de couverture avec au moins deux éléments de construction et procédé de fabrication d'un tel élément | [2012/24] |
Former [2006/06] | Bauteil, Abdeckung mit mindestens zwei Bauteilen und Herstellungsverfahren eines Bauteils | ||
Former [2006/06] | Covering element with at least two structural components and manufacturing process of such a component | ||
Former [2006/06] | Elément de couverture avec au moins deux éléments de construction et procédé de fabrication d'un tel élément | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2005 | CY | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 15.06.2013 | LU | 15.06.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.06.2005 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.06.2013 | ||
LU | 15.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3105681 (EBNER WALTER) [A] 9* claim 6 *; | [A]US6122890 (POLLITT CLIFFORD BRUCE [GB]) [A] * column 1, line 14 - line 19 * * column 1, line 28 *; | [X]DE10131248 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10-12,14 * paragraph [0023]; figures 2,3 *; | [DX]DE10333627 (KAINDL WALS M [AT]) [DX] 1,2,4-7,10-14 * paragraph [0114]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004053257 (PERGO EUROP AB [SE]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 23; figures 1-6 * | Examination | WO0102671 | WO03048481 | by applicant | WO9426999 | DE29703962U | WO9747834 | WO0166876 | WO0166877 | EP1229181 | DE10333627 | DE20319121U | DE20319119U |