EP1612356 - Hinging device for windows and doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Torino, 25 (S.S. 25) 10050 Chiusa San Michele / IT | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balbo di Vinadio, Aimone Via Cavour, 35 10123 Torino / IT | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/01] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05013228.1 | 20.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | IT2004TO00437 | 28.06.2004 Original published format: IT TO20040437 | [2006/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612356 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612356 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612356 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/52 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
E05D15/5211 (EP);
E05D15/30 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Scharniervorrichtung für Fenster und Türe | [2006/01] | English: | Hinging device for windows and doors | [2006/01] | French: | Dispositif de charnière pour fenêtres et portes | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 08.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | DK | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | LT | 22.10.2008 | RO | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | SE | 22.01.2009 | IS | 22.02.2009 | AT | 20.06.2009 | IE | 20.06.2009 | LU | 20.06.2009 | HU | 21.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
AT | 20.06.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
LU | 20.06.2009 | ||
HU | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
AT | 20.06.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
HU | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
HU | 21.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 22.10.2008 | |
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 22.10.2008 | |
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 22.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0385414 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 22 - line 39; figure 3 * |