EP1609959 - Engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2010/33] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Yoshiharu Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013370.1 | 21.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | JP20040181932 | 21.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004181932 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609959 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609959 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609959 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/02 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
F01L1/0532 (EP,US);
F01L1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [2005/52] | English: | Engine | [2005/52] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
LT | 18.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5874810 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,15 * abstract *; | [A]US4610224 (FUJITA HIROYA [JP]) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH08135427 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1,4,7-9 * abstract *; | [E]US6976476 (MANTRI SUBHASH V [US]) [E] 5,6* figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH0475364 | JPH08135427 |