EP1736406 - Airplane with an electric drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makarov, Vladimir Kubanskya Strasse 24 664009 Irkutsk City / RU | For all designated states Demin, Konstantin Androvova prospekt 30 flat 151 115487 Moscow / RU | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05013401.4 | 22.06.2005 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736406 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/24 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
B64D27/24 (EP);
B64D27/353 (EP);
A63H27/02 (EP);
A63H29/22 (EP);
Y02T50/50 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Flugzeug mit Elektroantrieb | [2006/52] | English: | Airplane with an electric drive | [2006/52] | French: | Aéronef à propulsion électromécanique | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/25] | 13.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3391752 (LUCAS ALBRIGHT PENROSE); | [Y]US3937424 (MEIER HANS JUSTUS, et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4697761 (LONG DAVID E [US]); | [DY]US4768738 (WEINERT FRIEDRICH [US]) [DY] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004211862 (ELAM DARYL B [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figure 5 * | by applicant | US4415133 | US4768738 | JPH10119896 | US6045089 |