EP1609940 - Anti-fall device for roll-type closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Javey, Michel 7, rue de Ménans 70700 Gy / FR | [2009/50] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Javey, Michel 7, rue Menans 70700 Gy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies 16, rue Gambetta 25000 Besançon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies Cabinet Ballot 25A Rue Proudhon 25000 Besançon / FR | Application number, filing date | 05013407.1 | 22.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | FR20040007104 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0407104 | [2005/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609940 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609940 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/60 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
E06B9/84 (EP);
E05D13/003 (EP);
E05Y2900/00 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Abfallsicherheitsvorrichtung eines Rollvorhangs | [2005/52] | English: | Anti-fall device for roll-type closure | [2005/52] | French: | Système de déblocage d'un dispositif anti-chute pour fermeture à enroulement | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | FERMETURES JAVEY SAS Zone Industrielle 70700 Gy / FR | Date: | 05.07.2008 | [2008/42] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | GB | 22.06.2010 | LU | 22.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
GB | 22.06.2010 | ||
LU | 22.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
GB | 22.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
GB | 22.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5253693 (MARLATT WAYNE G [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [AD]EP0845575 (JAVEY MICHEL [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0922832 (JAVEY MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1030028 (PROFILMAR [FR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0036]; figures 2,4,6 * |