EP1622211 - Organic electroluminescent device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Woo Chan 425-305, Maetan-Jugong 4th Apt. Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do 443-708 / KR | [2011/50] |
Former [2006/15] | 01 /
Kim, Woo Chan 425-305, Maetan-Jugong 4th Apt. Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do 443-708 / KR | ||
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Kim, Woo Chan LG Dormitory Nr.205, 265-20 Gongdan 2-dong, Gumi Kyongsangbuk-do 730-032 / KR | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg) Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013443.6 | 22.06.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | KR20040058676 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004058676 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622211 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1622211 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622211 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L27/15 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H10K50/844 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H10K59/173 (EP,US);
H10K59/8722 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | H01L51/10, H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Organische elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung | [2006/05] | English: | Organic electroluminescent device | [2006/05] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent organique | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2005 | AT | 14.12.2011 | BE | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | IT | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | IE | 22.06.2012 | LU | 22.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
LU | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003085654 (HAYASHI KENJI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [Y] 3; | [XY]US2003117066 (SILVERNAIL JEFFREY ALAN [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] *[Y] 3; | [Y] - MAN B Y ET AL, "Microstructure, oxidation and H2-permeation resistance of TiAlN films deposited by DC magnetron sputtering technique", SURFACE & COATINGS TECHNOLOGY ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (20040301), vol. 180-181, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 9 - 14, XP002593990 [Y] 3 * page 9, column 2; table 1 * * page 13, column 1, lines 6-26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2003.10.021 |