EP1615145 - System and method for graphically illustrating external data source information in the form of a visual hierarchy in an electronic workspace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corel Corporation 1600 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Z 8R7 / CA | [2017/09] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Mindjet LLC 125 E. Sir Francis Drake Blvd., Fourth Floor Larkspur, CA 94939 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jetter, Michael B. 19 Gregory Place Greenbrae CA 94904 / US | 02 /
Scherotter, Micahel S. 161 Lansdale Avenue Fairfax CA 94930 / US | 03 /
Holmes, Christopher C. 1765 Oak Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Funk, Stefan 33 Frances Avenue Larkspur CA 94939 / US | 05 /
Hizalev, Petro 605 Webster Street San Francisco CA 94117 / US | 06 /
Bashford, Steven Buchackerstrasse 3a 63867 Breunsberg / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013614.2 | 23.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | US20040882556 | 01.07.2004 Original published format: US 882556 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1615145 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1615145 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22, G06F17/24 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/34 (EP,US);
G06F40/106 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/154 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | G06F17/24, G06F17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur graphischen Darstellung von Informationen aus einer externen Datenquelle in Form eines visuellen Hierarchie in einem elektronischen Arbeitsplatz | [2012/23] | English: | System and method for graphically illustrating external data source information in the form of a visual hierarchy in an electronic workspace | [2006/02] | French: | Système et procédé pour illustrer graphiquement des informations d'une source de données externe sous la forme d'une hiérarchie visuelle dans un espace de travail électronique | [2012/23] |
Former [2006/02] | Système et procédé pour illustrer graphiquement des informations d'une source de données externe sous la forme d'une hiérarchie visuelle dans un espace de travail électronique | ||
Former [2006/02] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur graphischen Darstellung von Informationen aus einer externen Datenquelle in Form eines visuellen Hierarchie in einem elektronischen Arbeitsplatz | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2018 | 14.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 27.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/34] | 04.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03014965 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A] - JODEF JELINEK AND P. SLAVIK, "XML visualization using tree rewriting", SPRING CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH SPRING CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS, Budmerice, Slovakia, (20040422), XP002444098 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - JEAN DELAHOUSSE, "Index and knowledge drawing : a natural bridge from Topic Maps to XML SVG", XML USA, Orlando, Florida, USA, (20011209), URL: http://www.idealliance.org/papers/xml2001/papers/pdf/04-04-02.pdf, (20070725), XP002444099 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | Examination | - Martin Leissler ET AL, "Automatic Updates of Interactive Information Visualization User Interfaces Supporting Multimedia Information Retrieval through Database Triggers", Proceedings of the Fifth Working Conference on Visual Database Systems: Advances in Visual Information Management, Kluwer Academic Publishers., Fukuoka, Japan, (20000510), ISBN 0792378350, XP055177939 | by applicant | WO03014965 | US6946208 |