EP1584603 - Steam reforming reactor for synthesis gas production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/42] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christensen, Peter Seier Batbyggaregatan 166 21642 Limhamn / SE | 02 /
Hansen, Tommy Hjaltesvej 6 3080 Tikob / DK | 03 /
Hansen, Viggo Lucassen Botoftevej 12 2700 Bronshoj / DK | 04 /
Andersen, Lars Ejby Madsholmsvej 63 3000 Helsingor / DK | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/41] | 01 /
Christensen, Peter Seier Batbyggaregatan 166 21642 Limhamn / SE | ||
02 /
Hansen, Tommy Hjaltesvej 6 3080 Tikob / DK | |||
03 /
Hansen, Viggo Lucassen Botoftevej 12 2700 Bronshoj / DK | |||
04 /
Andersen, Lars Ejby Dyresovej 11 3000 Helsingor / DK | Application number, filing date | 05013703.3 | 17.04.2000 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | US19990136398P | 27.05.1999 Original published format: US 136398 P | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584603 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584603 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B01J12/007 (EP);
B01J19/2495 (EP);
C01B3/38 (EP);
C01B3/40 (EP);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/1035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/41] | Title | German: | Wasserdampfreformierungsreaktor zur Herstellung von Synthesegas | [2005/41] | English: | Steam reforming reactor for synthesis gas production | [2005/41] | French: | Réacteur de reformage à la vapeur d'eau pour la production de gaz de synthèse | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00108369.0 / EP1055637 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000108369) is 03.06.2002 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS59205332 ; | [X]FR2333571 (INST NAWOZOW SZTUCZNYCH [PL]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 1-19; example 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5521139 (BROECKER FRANZ J [DE], et al) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [Y]DE19534433 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 41 *; | [YD]EP0855366 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [YD] 1 * claim 1 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850330), vol. 009, no. 071, Database accession no. (C - 272), & JP59205332 A 19841120 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [AD] 1 * abstract * |