EP1621453 - Vehicle body with parts with variable steel sheet thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muhr und Bender KG In den Schlachtwiesen 4 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauger, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Hohler Weg 32 57439 Attendorn / DE | 02 /
Muhr, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. Mühlhardt 45 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2007/41] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Hauger, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Hohler Weg 38 57439 Attendorn / DE | ||
02 /
Muhr, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. Mühlhardt 45 57439 Attendorn / DE | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013825.4 | 27.06.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | DE20041037206 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004037206 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621453 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621453 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00, // B62D25/00, B62D21/15 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B62D65/00 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (EP,US);
B62D25/00 (EP,US);
C21D7/02 (EP,US);
C21D8/0436 (EP,US);
B21B2261/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | B62D65/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/13] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugkarosserie mit Einzelteilen aus variabler Blechdicke | [2006/05] | English: | Vehicle body with parts with variable steel sheet thickness | [2006/05] | French: | Carosserie contenant des pièces en tôle à épaisseur variable | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0788849 (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,12,14 * column 2, lines 29-36 - column 4, lines 17-23 *; | [X]DE19704300 (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,12-14 * column 1, lines 6-30 - column 3, lines 61-66; claims 1,4 *; | [X]EP0979693 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0015]; claim 11 *; | [X]DE10103487 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 3,4,7,9,11* paragraphs [0026] , [0042] , [0046] , [0009] *; | [PX]EP1481743 (MUHR & BENDER KG [DE]) [PX] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0022] , [0024] , [0026]; claims 32-36 *; | [X] - KOPP R ET AL, "BELASTUNGSANGEPASSTE BLECHE DURCH FLEXIBLES WALZEN", VDI Z, SPRINGER VDI VERLAG, DUSSELDORF, DE, (19981001), no. SPECIAL ISSUE, ISSN 0042-1766, pages 50/51 - 53, XP000827017 [X] 1,2,5,7-10,12-14,3,4,6,11 * page 2, column 3; figure 3 * * page 3, column 2, lines 8-18; figure 5 * |