EP1621373 - Roll stiffness control apparatus of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuta, Yuichi@c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Mizuta, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05013971.6 | 28.06.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | JP20040200339 | 07.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004200339 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621373 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621373 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/06, B60G17/016, B60G17/018, B60G17/0195 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B60G17/0162 (EP,US);
B60G17/0182 (EP,US);
B60G17/0195 (EP,US);
B60G21/0555 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W10/22 (EP,US);
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60G2202/40 (EP,US);
B60G2204/81 (EP,US);
B60G2204/82 (EP,US);
B60G2204/8302 (EP,US);
B60G2400/051 (EP,US);
B60G2400/0523 (EP,US);
B60G2400/104 (EP,US);
B60G2400/106 (EP,US);
B60G2400/204 (EP,US);
B60G2400/25 (EP,US);
B60G2400/41 (EP,US);
B60G2400/50 (EP,US);
B60G2600/187 (EP,US);
B60G2800/012 (EP,US);
B60G2800/0122 (EP,US);
B60G2800/214 (EP,US);
B60G2800/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | B60G17/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Fahrzeugrollsteifigkeit | [2006/05] | English: | Roll stiffness control apparatus of vehicle | [2006/05] | French: | Dispositif pour contrôler la rigidité de roulis de vehicule | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH06211018 ; | [A]EP0453771 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-12; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0556055 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE4404098 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2002128760 (BODIE MARK OLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-21* paragraphs [0003] - [0018]; figures 1-10; claims 1-11 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941104), vol. 018, no. 576, Database accession no. (M - 1697), & JP06211018 A 19940802 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1-21 * abstract * |