EP1607575 - Method for cooling an airfoil wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auxier, Thomas A. 8286 Kelso Drive Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | 02 /
Downs, James P. 325 Leeward Drive Jupiter, FL 33477 / US | 03 /
Calhoun, William H. 6274 Braidwood Run Akworth, GA 30101 / US | 04 /
Kvasnak, William S. 8 Ipswich Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 05 /
Soechting, Friedrich O. 19483 Riverside Drive Tequesta, FL 33469 / US | 06 /
Hayes, Douglas A. 377 S.W. Log Drive Port St. Lucie, FL 34953 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
Auxier, Thomas A. 8286 Kelso Drive Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | ||
02 /
Downs, James P. 325 Leeward Drive Jupiter, FL 33477 / US | |||
03 /
Calhoun, William H. 6274 Braidwood Run Akworth, GA 30101 / US | |||
04 /
Kyasnak, William S. 43 Oriole Circle Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
05 /
Soechting, Friedrich O. 19483 Riverside Drive Tequesta, FL 33469 / US | |||
06 /
Hayes, Douglas A. 377 S.W. Log Drive Port St. Lucie, FL 34953 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/51] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05014273.6 | 23.06.2000 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US19990338376 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: US 338376 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607575 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607575 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F01D5/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2230/14 (EP,US);
F05D2250/15 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/51] | Title | German: | Methode zur Kühlung einer Wand einer Strömungsmaschinenschaufel | [2005/51] | English: | Method for cooling an airfoil wall | [2005/51] | French: | Méthode de refroidissement de paroi pour une aube de turbomachine | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 09.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00305313.9 / EP1063388 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Request for further processing for: | 09.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4177010 (GREAVES TERENCE M [GB], et al) [A] 1-5* column 3; figure 2 *; | [A]US4302940 (MEGINNIS GEORGE B) [A] 1-5 * columns 5,7; figures 3-8 *; | [A]US4992026 (OHTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |