EP1625966 - Vehicle seat with lowered to floor position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kämmerer, Joachim Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 39 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014363.5 | 01.07.2005 | [2006/07] | Priority number, date | DE20041039249 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004039249 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625966 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1625966 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60N2/30, B60N2/10, B60N2/20, B60N2/22 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
B60N2/3065 (EP,US);
B60N2/0292 (EP,US);
B60N2/10 (EP,US);
B60N2/206 (EP,US);
B60N2/22 (EP,US);
B60N2/3031 (EP,US);
B60N2/309 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | B60N2/02, B60N2/30 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/42] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz mit Bodenstellung | [2006/07] | English: | Vehicle seat with lowered to floor position | [2006/07] | French: | Siège véhicule avec position abaissée au niveau du plancher | [2006/07] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6000742 (SCHAEFER DONALD RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 16; figures 4-7 *; | [A]WO0222391 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 25 - page 11, line 28; figures 1-3,7B *; | [A]GB2386549 (LEAR CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 26; figures 7-9 * |