EP1746499 - System and method for developping a software or softwarecomponent and method for operating such a software [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karl-Dietze, Ludwig Welserstrasse 4a 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 02 /
Rother, Klaus Printzenhof 42 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | [2007/04] | Application number, filing date | 05014579.6 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746499 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G06F8/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/39] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Entwicklung einer Software oder einer Softwarekomponente sowie Verfahren zum Betrieb einer solchen Software | [2007/04] | English: | System and method for developping a software or softwarecomponent and method for operating such a software | [2007/04] | French: | Système et méthode pour le développement d'un logiciel ou d'une composante logicielle et méthode d'opération d'un tel logiciel | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 25.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.11.2017 | 02.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0154061 (Q3DM CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 19 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, line 6 - line 15 * * page 11, line 24 - page 15, line 15 *; | [X]EP1505493 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0142] *; | [X] - NEUMANN G, ZDUN U, "XOTcl - Tutorial (version 1.3.6)", (20050317), pages I,1 - 62, URL: http://media.wu-wien.ac.at/download/xotcl-1.3.6.tar.gz, XP002356986 [X] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6 * * page 8, paragraph 8 - page 10, paragraph L * * page 19, paragraph 8 - page 21, paragraph L * * page 33, paragraph 7 - page 34, paragraph 1 * * page 49, paragraph 1 - page 51, paragraph 6 * | [A] - HAUCK F J, "Typisierte Vererbung modelliert durch Aggregation", TECHNICAL REPORT TR-14-9-93, (199309), pages I-II,1 - 12, URL: http://www-vs.informatik.uni-ulm.de/bib/1994/vererbung.pdf, XP002356987 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [L] - NEUMANN G, ZDUN U, "XOTcl News", (2005), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://media.wu-wien.ac.at/, XP002356989 [L] * the whole document * |