EP1614651 - Measuring scale for the detection of the lifting height. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hämmerl, Robert Lindenstrasse 7 84098 Hohenthann / DE | 02 /
Schöttke, Carsten Am Mühlbachbogen 43c 85368 Moosburg / DE | 03 /
Schröder, Klaus Leising 6 92339 Beilngries / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014686.9 | 06.07.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041033170 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033170 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614651 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1614651 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614651 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B66F9/0755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/03] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Massverkörperung für Hubhöhensensierung | [2006/02] | English: | Measuring scale for the detection of the lifting height. | [2006/02] | French: | Echelle de mesure pour la détection de la hauteur de levage. | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3723841 (COTTON R, et al) [A] 1-3,7 * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 2 *; | [A]US3782565 (MADDOCK J, et al) [A] 1-3,7 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 38 - line 45 *; | [A]US4130183 (TJORNEMARK ERIK) [A] 1-3,7 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 20 - line 29 *; | [A]CH654810 (OWL AG) [A] 1 * page 3, column R, line 9 - line 37; figure 3 *; | [X]JPH09132399 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] *; | [X]JPH11292498 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]DE10314795 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 4-6* the whole document * | by applicant | DE10314795 |