EP1741947 - Actuating cylinder for hydraulic clutch actuation in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Markus An den Freihöfen 11 97440 Werneck-Zeuzleben / DE | 02 /
Knysak, Thomas Leo-Weismantel-Strasse 30 97705 Münnerstadt / DE | [2007/02] | Application number, filing date | 05014864.2 | 08.07.2005 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741947 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/12, F16D23/12, B60T11/16, B60T11/236 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B60T11/236 (EP);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D25/12 (EP);
F16D2025/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/37] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Betätigungszylinder für eine hydraulische Kupplungsbetätigung in Kraftfahrzeugen | [2007/02] | English: | Actuating cylinder for hydraulic clutch actuation in a motor vehicle | [2007/02] | French: | Cylindre de commande pour actionnement hydraulique d'embrayage pour un véhicule à moteur | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4024483 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 11 - line 20 ** figure - *; | [DY]DE19516391 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [DY] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]DE19903466 (MAGENWIRTH GMBH CO GUSTAV [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 34 - line 57 * * figure - *; | [Y]DE10021995 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0017] * * figure - * | by applicant | DE19516391 |