EP1583346 - Image input apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/40] | Image input apparatus, program executed by computer, and method for preparing document with image | ||
[2007/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seki, Kazuyuki c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 306 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Keichi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 306 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Koshiishi, Takaho c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 306 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05014957.4 | 30.03.2001 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000100126 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000100126 | JP20000100137 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000100137 | JP20000136406 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000136406 | JP20000109973 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109973 | JP20000109974 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109974 | JP20000109975 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000109975 | JP20000269419 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000269419 | JP20000269420 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000269420 | JP20000269421 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000269421 | JP20010073153 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001073153 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583346 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1583346 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583346 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, H04N1/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04N1/00973 (EP,US);
H04N1/00132 (EP,US);
H04N1/00183 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00427 (EP,US);
H04N1/0044 (EP,US);
H04N1/00472 (EP,US);
H04N1/0097 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N23/633 (EP,US);
H04N23/64 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3263 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3264 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/26] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildeingabegerät | [2007/42] | English: | Image input apparatus | [2007/42] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée d'image | [2007/42] |
Former [2005/40] | Bildeingabegerät, durch Rechner ausgeführtes Programm, und Verfahren zur Vorbereitung eines Dokuments mit Bild | ||
Former [2005/40] | Image input apparatus, program executed by computer, and method for preparing document with image | ||
Former [2005/40] | Dispositif d'entrée d'image, programme exécuté par ordinateur, et procédé de préparation de document avec image | Examination procedure | 11.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01303035.8 / EP1148703 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5812736 (ANDERSON ERIC C [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1 *; | [Y]EP0905679 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] - [0007] *; | [Y]WO9948276 (FLASHPOINT TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 17 *; | [Y]US5963964 (NIELSEN JAKOB [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0974916 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * |