EP1619405 - Bicycle disc brake rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinichi, Takizawa 3191-20, Hineno Izumisano Osaka / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015131.5 | 12.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | JP20040213148 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004213148 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619405 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619405 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP,US);
B62L1/005 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1316 (EP,US);
F16D2065/132 (EP,US);
F16D2200/003 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0039 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0052 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrradbremsscheibenrotor | [2006/04] | English: | Bicycle disc brake rotor | [2006/04] | French: | Rotor de frein à disque pour une bicyclette | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.06.2009 | FR | 24.08.2009 | GB | 24.09.2009 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/23] | NL | 24.06.2009 | |
FR | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | NL | 24.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DAY]JPH02113134 ; | [A]FR2717875 (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [AY]EP1016803 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009]; figures 2-6 * [Y] 19,20 | [DAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900717), vol. 014, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 0999), & JP02113134 A 19900425 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document * [Y] 19,20 | by applicant | JP2679162B |