EP1743689 - Crossflow filtration apparatus and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kammerloher, Helmut Pettenbrunn 5a 85354 Freising / DE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015228.9 | 13.07.2005 | [2007/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743689 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/14, B01D61/22, B01D61/16, B01D61/20, C12H1/06 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
C12H1/063 (EP);
B01D61/1471 (EP,US);
B01D61/16 (EP);
B01D61/20 (EP);
B01D61/22 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/16, B01D2311/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Crossflow-Membranfilteranlage sowie Verfahren | [2007/03] | English: | Crossflow filtration apparatus and process | [2007/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de filtrage tangentiel | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63221805 ; | [A]JPH06134210 ; | [A]JPH0411929 ; | [A]JPS63221805 ; | [A]US5076931 (MUELLER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [X]US2002117438 (BLUME INGO [NL], et al); | [A]US6521127 (CHANCELLOR DENNIS [US]); |