EP1619018 - Concrete curing blanket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mc Tech Group, Inc. 120 B Camp Street Loganville, Georgia 30052 / US | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDonald Stephen F. 4426 Hugh Howell Road B//13 Tucker GA 30084 / US | 02 /
Abitz Peter R. 1400 West 9th Street Brunswick GA 31520 / US | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Ryan, Anne Mary Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/04] | Laitinen, Pauli Sakari Patentti-Laitinen Oy, P.O. Box 29 02771 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 05015379.0 | 15.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | US20040897420 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 897420 | US20050968926 | 03.01.2005 Original published format: US 968926 | US20050707546 | 09.03.2005 Original published format: US 707546 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1619018 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1619018 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/08, B32B27/12, C04B40/04, D04H13/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B28B11/245 (EP);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (US);
C04B40/04 (EP);
D04H1/425 (EP);
D04H1/4374 (EP);
D04H1/43828 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/541 (EP,US);
D04H1/5418 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP);
E04G21/246 (EP);
B32B2307/7163 (US);
B32B2307/7242 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | HR | 18.07.2005 | Title | German: | Austrocknungsschutzdecke für frischen Beton | [2006/04] | English: | Concrete curing blanket | [2006/04] | French: | Couverture de protection pour le béton frais | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 23.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2010 | 31.07.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2010 | 31.07.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0811122 ; | [XY]US2133641 (TOMPKINS WILLIAM M) [X] 9 * page 1, column R, line 34 - page 2, column R, line 40 * [Y] 10; | [A]DE1002018 (STRABAG BAU AG) [A] 9 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 8 *; | [XD]US4485137 (WHITE RICHARD L [US]) [XD] 11 * the whole document *; | [X]US4900377 (REDFORD DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * columns 16-12 * * column 7, lines 26-34 * * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 26 * * column 11, lines 1-13; examples 4,5 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 12, Database accession no. 1996-111308, XP002375302 & JPH0811122 A 19960116 (NIPPON KOATSU CONCRETE KK) [Y] 10 * abstract * | by applicant | US4485137 | - C. A. HERUBIN; T. W. NAROTTA, BASIC CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS, RESTON BOOK |