EP1621406 - Housing with a longitudinal profil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOS GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Heinkel-Strasse 2 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Herbert Krapfenreuter Strasse 64 73061 Ebersbach / DE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015595.1 | 19.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | DE20041038077 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004038077 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621406 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621406 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B60R5/047 (EP,US);
B60R5/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Kassettengehäuse mit einem längserstreckten Profil | [2006/05] | English: | Housing with a longitudinal profil | [2006/05] | French: | Boîtier de cassette avec profil longitudinal | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | IE | 07.03.2007 | IT | 07.03.2007 | LT | 07.03.2007 | LV | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | PL | 07.03.2007 | RO | 07.03.2007 | SI | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | IS | 07.07.2007 | AT | 19.07.2007 | LU | 19.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | HU | 08.09.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
AT | 19.07.2007 | ||
LU | 19.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
HU | 08.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
AT | 19.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
AT | 19.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
AT | 19.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
LT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
LV | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
IS | 07.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
PL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6213186 (TORRES DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 37; figure - *; | [X]DE10212336 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1* figure - * |