EP1624005 - Polymer polyols with ultra-high solids contents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauk, Shriniwas S. 504 Dabney Drive Charleston WV 25314 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Weismantel, Lothar Bayer MaterialScience AG Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Weismantel, Lothar Bayer MaterialScience AG, Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015715.5 | 20.07.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | US20040909493 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 909493 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624005 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624005 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/63, C08F283/06, C08F290/06 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C08G18/702 (EP,US);
C08G18/28 (KR);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08F290/062 (EP,US);
C08G18/632 (EP,US);
C08G18/636 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C08G18/68 (EP,US);
C08G65/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | Polymer Polyole mit sehr hohem Feststoffgehalt | [2006/06] | English: | Polymer polyols with ultra-high solids contents | [2006/06] | French: | Polyols polymères à ultra-haute teneur en solides | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | LV | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | LU | 20.07.2008 | IE | 21.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
LU | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
LU | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
IE | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0461800 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [X] 1,5-15,19-31 * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 2 * * page 13, lines 20-37; examples 4-10 * * claims 23-33,37-39 *; | US5196476 [ ] (SIMROTH DONALD W [US]) [ ] * cited in application *; | [X]WO9715605 (POLYOL INT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,5-15,19-31 * page 4, lines 17-23 * * page 11, lines 26-30; examples 3-9 * * claims 7-15 *; | US5990185 [ ] (FOGG GRAEME DOUGLAS [NL]) [ ] * cited in application *; | [X]WO03097710 (BASF CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * page 4, lines 12-36 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 17 * * page 7, lines 29-36 * * examples and Figure 4 * * claims 1,6-16,20,36 * |